California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB882 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2010

Amended

Bill June 17, 2010
Bill May 11, 2010
Bill April 28, 2010
Bill April 5, 2010