LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB882
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB882
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB882
Compare Versions
SB882 Chaptered September 27, 2010
SB882 Enrolled August 23, 2010
SB882 Amended June 17, 2010
SB882 Amended May 11, 2010
SB882 Amended April 28, 2010
SB882 Amended April 5, 2010
SB882 Introduced January 14, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB882 Chaptered September 27, 2010
SB882 Enrolled August 23, 2010
SB882 Amended June 17, 2010
SB882 Amended May 11, 2010
SB882 Amended April 28, 2010
SB882 Amended April 5, 2010
SB882 Introduced January 14, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare