|
06/22/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5744.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5695.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (Heard in Committee on June 17.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
To Coms. on PUB. S. and TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3413.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3165.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 25.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|