|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 630, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2010
|
To Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Correctly enrolled. Held at Desk pursuant to Joint Rule 57.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 4658.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6249.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 2. Page 3658.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3593.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 27.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|