California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB910 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/30/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 910CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 630 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 30, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 30, 2010 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 19, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 16, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 2, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 12, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Kehoe JANUARY 27, 2010 An act relating to state claims, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 910, Kehoe. State claims. Existing law requires the California Victim Compensation and Government Claims Board to ensure that all claims that have been approved by the board and for which there exists no legally available appropriation, are submitted for legislative approval at least twice each calendar year. This bill would appropriate $1,224,892.14 from the General Fund to the Executive Officer of the California Victim Compensation and Government Claims Board to pay claims accepted by the board. The bill would require the Controller, upon the request of the board, in a form prescribed by the Controller, to transfer surcharges and fees from the General Fund to Item 1870-001-0001 of Section 2.00 of the Budget Act of 2010. This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. Appropriation: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. (a) The sum of one million two hundred twenty-four thousand eight hundred ninety-two dollars and fourteen cents ($1,224,892.14) is hereby appropriated from the General Fund to the Executive Officer of the California Victim Compensation and Government Claims Board for the payment of claims accepted by the board in accordance with the schedule set forth in subdivision (b). (b) Pursuant to subdivision (a), claims accepted by the California Victim Compensation and Government Claims Board shall be paid in accordance with the following schedule: Total for Fund: General ....................... Fund (0001) $1,224,892.14 SEC. 2. Upon the request of the California Victim Compensation and Government Claims Board in a form prescribed by the Controller, the Controller shall transfer surcharges and fees from the General Fund to Item 1870-001-0001 of Section 2.00 of the Budget Act of 2010. For each Budget Act item of appropriation, this amount shall not exceed the cumulative total of the per claim filing fees authorized by subdivision (b) of Section 905.2 of the Government Code and the surcharge authorized by subdivision (f) of Section 905.2 of the Government Code. For those items in subdivision (b) of Section 1 that do not reflect a Budget Act appropriation, the Controller shall transfer an amount not to exceed the cumulative total of the per claim filing fees authorized by subdivision (b) of Section 905.2 of the Government Code and the surcharge authorized by subdivision (f) of Section 905.2 of the Government Code. This amount shall be transferred for support of the board as reimbursements to Item 1870-001-0001 of Section 2.00 of the Budget Act of 2010. The board shall provide a report of the amount recovered pursuant to this authority to the Department of Finance within 90 days of the enactment of this act. SEC. 3. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order to pay claims against the state and end hardship to claimants as quickly as possible, it is necessary that this act take effect immediately.