|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 555, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2284.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2884.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2824.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 973.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 254.)
|
|
|
|
02/09/2009
|
Set for hearing March 4.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 22.
|
|
|
|
01/22/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|