LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB93
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB93
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB93
Compare Versions
SB93 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB93 Enrolled September 10, 2009
SB93 Amended August 31, 2009
SB93 Amended July 14, 2009
SB93 Amended July 1, 2009
SB93 Amended May 18, 2009
SB93 Amended April 28, 2009
SB93 Amended March 10, 2009
SB93 Introduced January 22, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB93 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB93 Enrolled September 10, 2009
SB93 Amended August 31, 2009
SB93 Amended July 14, 2009
SB93 Amended July 1, 2009
SB93 Amended May 18, 2009
SB93 Amended April 28, 2009
SB93 Amended March 10, 2009
SB93 Introduced January 22, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare