|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 630, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 36. Noes 4. Page 2285.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 10. Page 2941.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2824.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on July 9.)
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Heard in committee on July 6.)
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 973.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 586.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 396.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2009
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
To Coms. on B., F. & I. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 22.
|
|
|
|
01/22/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|