California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB94 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill August 31, 2009
Bill July 23, 2009
Bill July 15, 2009
Bill June 11, 2009
Bill April 28, 2009
Bill April 13, 2009
Bill March 23, 2009
Bill March 9, 2009