07/19/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 114, Statutes of 2010. | |||
07/19/2010 | Approved by Governor. | |||
07/07/2010 | Enrolled. To Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |||
07/01/2010 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4195.) To enrollment. | |||
06/28/2010 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
06/28/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 5842.) To Senate. | |||
06/24/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/23/2010 | Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |||
06/22/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on June 16.) | |||
06/10/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
05/06/2010 | To Com. on ED. | |||
04/08/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/08/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3113.) To Assembly. | |||
03/24/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3016.) | |||
03/09/2010 | Set for hearing March 24. | |||
02/04/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 6. | |||
02/03/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |