California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB944 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2010

Enrolled

Bill July 2, 2010

Chaptered

Bill July 19, 2010

Amended

Bill June 23, 2010
Bill June 10, 2010
Bill March 16, 2010