|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 556, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 21. Noes 10. Page 2116.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 23. Page 2675.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on July 15.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 17. Page 1193.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 19. Page 1148.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Corbett. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1148.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1067.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 383.)
|
|
|
|
03/17/2009
|
Set for hearing March 31.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 22.
|
|
|
|
01/22/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|