LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB95
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB95
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB95
Compare Versions
SB95 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB95 Enrolled September 4, 2009
SB95 Amended July 1, 2009
SB95 Amended May 28, 2009
SB95 Amended May 4, 2009
SB95 Amended April 14, 2009
SB95 Amended March 16, 2009
SB95 Introduced January 22, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB95 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB95 Enrolled September 4, 2009
SB95 Amended July 1, 2009
SB95 Amended May 28, 2009
SB95 Amended May 4, 2009
SB95 Amended April 14, 2009
SB95 Amended March 16, 2009
SB95 Introduced January 22, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare