|
07/15/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 105, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5852.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3587.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
From Special Consent Calendar. Placed on third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading. To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3444.)
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3068.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
To Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 7.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|