California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB953 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2010

Enrolled

Bill June 29, 2010

Chaptered

Bill July 15, 2010

Amended

Bill May 19, 2010
Bill May 12, 2010
Bill March 16, 2010