07/01/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/29/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/28/2010 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
04/27/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 4. Page 3294.) | |||
04/16/2010 | Set for hearing April 21. | |||
04/15/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
02/18/2010 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/05/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 7. | |||
02/04/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |