LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB955
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB955
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB955
Compare Versions
SB955 Amended July 1, 2010
SB955 Amended June 2, 2010
SB955 Amended April 28, 2010
SB955 Amended April 13, 2010
SB955 Introduced February 4, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB955 Amended July 1, 2010
SB955 Amended June 2, 2010
SB955 Amended April 28, 2010
SB955 Amended April 13, 2010
SB955 Introduced February 4, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare