|
06/24/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Coms. on L. & E. and ED.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 3732.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 3669.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3182.)
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2010
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 2937.)
|
|
|
|
03/03/2010
|
Set for hearing March 10.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
To Coms. on L. & I.R. and ED.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 8. Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2010
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|