LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB956
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB956
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB956
Compare Versions
SB956 Amended June 1, 2010
SB956 Amended April 21, 2010
SB956 Amended April 7, 2010
SB956 Amended March 17, 2010
SB956 Introduced February 5, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB956 Amended June 1, 2010
SB956 Amended April 21, 2010
SB956 Amended April 7, 2010
SB956 Amended March 17, 2010
SB956 Introduced February 5, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare