|
08/18/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 7. Page 3725.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3670.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3294.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
To Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 8. Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2010
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|