LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB969
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB969
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB969
Compare Versions
SB969 Amended August 17, 2010
SB969 Amended June 28, 2010
SB969 Amended June 1, 2010
SB969 Amended April 28, 2010
SB969 Introduced February 5, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB969 Amended August 17, 2010
SB969 Amended June 28, 2010
SB969 Amended June 1, 2010
SB969 Amended April 28, 2010
SB969 Introduced February 5, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare