|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 510, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5038.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6832.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 25.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6608.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6491.) Re-referred to Com. On JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6424.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 3. Page 3693.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3444.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|