LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB972
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB972
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB972
Compare Versions
SB972 Chaptered September 29, 2010
SB972 Enrolled September 2, 2010
SB972 Amended August 24, 2010
SB972 Amended August 20, 2010
SB972 Amended August 2, 2010
SB972 Amended June 23, 2010
SB972 Amended May 12, 2010
SB972 Amended April 5, 2010
SB972 Introduced February 8, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB972 Chaptered September 29, 2010
SB972 Enrolled September 2, 2010
SB972 Amended August 24, 2010
SB972 Amended August 20, 2010
SB972 Amended August 2, 2010
SB972 Amended June 23, 2010
SB972 Amended May 12, 2010
SB972 Amended April 5, 2010
SB972 Introduced February 8, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare