California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB972 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 09/29/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 972CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 510 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 29, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 29, 2010 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 30, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 30, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 24, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 20, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 2, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 23, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 12, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 5, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Wolk FEBRUARY 8, 2010 An act to amend Section 2782.8 of the Civil Code, relating to indemnity. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 972, Wolk. Indemnity: design professionals. Existing law provides, for all contracts, and amendments to contracts, entered into on or after January 1, 2007, with a public agency for design professional services, all provisions, clauses, covenants, and agreements contained in, collateral to, or affecting these contracts, that purport to indemnify, including the cost to defend, the public agency by a design professional against liability for claims against the public agency, are unenforceable, except for claims that arise out of, pertain to, or relate to the negligence, recklessness, or willful misconduct of the design professional. This bill would provide, with respect to contracts and amendments to contracts entered into on or after January 1, 2011, with a public agency for design professional services, that all provisions, clauses, covenants, and agreements contained in, collateral to, or affecting these contracts or amendments to contracts that purport to require the design professional to defend the public agency under an indemnity agreement, including the duty and the cost to defend, are unenforceable, except for claims that arise out of, pertain to, or relate to the negligence, recklessness, or willful misconduct of the design professional. The bill would provide that all contracts and all solicitation documents between a public agency and a design professional are deemed to incorporate these provisions by reference. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 2782.8 of the Civil Code is amended to read: 2782.8. (a) For all contracts, and amendments thereto, entered into on or after January 1, 2007, with a public agency for design professional services, all provisions, clauses, covenants, and agreements contained in, collateral to, or affecting any such contract, and amendments thereto, that purport to indemnify, including the duty and the cost to defend, the public agency by a design professional against liability for claims against the public agency, are unenforceable, except for claims that arise out of, pertain to, or relate to the negligence, recklessness, or willful misconduct of the design professional. The duty to indemnify, including the duty and the cost to defend, is limited as provided in this section. This section shall not be waived or modified by contractual agreement, act, or omission of the parties. Contractual provisions, clauses, covenants, or agreements not expressly prohibited herein are reserved to the agreement of the parties. (b) All contracts and all solicitation documents, including requests for proposal, invitations for bid, and other solicitation documents, between a public agency and a design professional, are deemed to incorporate by reference the provisions of this section. (c) For purposes of this section, the following definitions apply: (1) "Public agency" includes any county, city, city and county, district, school district, public authority, municipal corporation, or other political subdivision, joint powers authority, or public corporation in the state. Public agency does not include the State of California. (2) "Design professional" includes all of the following: (A) An individual licensed as an architect pursuant to Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 5500) of Division 3 of the Business and Professions Code, and a business entity offering architectural services in accordance with that chapter. (B) An individual licensed as a landscape architect pursuant to Chapter 3.5 (commencing with Section 5615) of Division 3 of the Business and Professions Code, and a business entity offering landscape architectural services in accordance with that chapter. (C) An individual registered as a professional engineer pursuant to Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 6700) of Division 3 of the Business and Professions Code, and a business entity offering professional engineering services in accordance with that chapter. (D) An individual licensed as a professional land surveyor pursuant to Chapter 15 (commencing with Section 8700) of Division 3 of the Business and Professions Code, and a business entity offering professional land surveying services in accordance with that chapter. (d) This section shall only apply to a professional service contract, or any amendment thereto, entered into on or after January 1, 2007. (e) The amendments made to this section by the act adding this subdivision shall apply to services offered pursuant to a design professional contract, or any amendment thereto, entered into on or after January 1, 2011. (f) Nothing in this section shall abrogate the provisions of Section 1104 of the Public Contract Code.