LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SBX52
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SBX52
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SBX52
Action History
11/03/2009
Set for hearing November 3.
11/02/2009
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 18.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
10/28/2009
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
09/09/2009
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
08/27/2009
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS.