LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SBX52
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SBX52
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SBX52
Compare Versions
SBX52 Chaptered January 7, 2010
SBX52 Enrolled December 18, 2009
SBX52 Amended December 10, 2009
SBX52 Amended December 3, 2009
SBX52 Amended November 3, 2009
SBX52 Amended October 28, 2009
SBX52 Introduced August 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SBX52 Chaptered January 7, 2010
SBX52 Enrolled December 18, 2009
SBX52 Amended December 10, 2009
SBX52 Amended December 3, 2009
SBX52 Amended November 3, 2009
SBX52 Amended October 28, 2009
SBX52 Introduced August 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare