03/09/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 4, Statutes of 2009-10 Eighth Extraordinary Session. | |||
03/08/2010 | Approved by Governor. | |||
03/03/2010 | Enrolled. To Governor at 3 p.m. | |||
03/01/2010 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 29. Noes 2. Page 101.) To enrollment. | |||
02/25/2010 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
02/25/2010 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 121.) To Senate. | |||
02/24/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on February 24.) | |||
02/23/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
02/22/2010 | Read third time. Amended. To third reading. Action rescinded and record expunged whereby a roll call vote was taken. | |||
02/11/2010 | Permission granted to take up without reference to committee or file. Read second time. To third reading. | |||
02/04/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
02/04/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 0. Page 29.) To Assembly. | |||
02/02/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
02/01/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |||
01/20/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. |