LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SBX84
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SBX84
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SBX84
Compare Versions
SBX84 Chaptered March 8, 2010
SBX84 Enrolled March 1, 2010
SBX84 Amended February 25, 2010
SBX84 Amended February 22, 2010
SBX84 Introduced January 20, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SBX84 Chaptered March 8, 2010
SBX84 Enrolled March 1, 2010
SBX84 Amended February 25, 2010
SBX84 Amended February 22, 2010
SBX84 Introduced January 20, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare