05/14/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 22, Statutes of 2009. | |||
05/14/2009 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
05/11/2009 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 825.) To enrollment. | |||
05/04/2009 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
05/04/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1241.) To Senate. | |||
04/28/2009 | Amended. To Consent Calendar. | |||
04/27/2009 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on April 23.) | |||
04/16/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
04/02/2009 | To Com. on RULES. | |||
12/02/2008 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
12/01/2008 | Introduced. Read and adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5.) To Assembly. |