LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR1
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR1
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR1
Compare Versions
SCR1 Chaptered May 14, 2009
SCR1 Enrolled May 12, 2009
SCR1 Amended April 28, 2009
SCR1 Amended April 16, 2009
SCR1 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 1 (Old)
SCR1 Chaptered May 14, 2009
SCR1 Enrolled May 12, 2009
SCR1 Amended April 28, 2009
SCR1 Amended April 16, 2009
SCR1 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 2 (New)
Compare