09/07/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 125, Statutes of 2010. | |||
09/07/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
08/31/2010 | In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5103.) To enrollment. | |||
08/31/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6935.) To Senate. | |||
08/30/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 30.) | |||
08/26/2010 | To Com. on RULES. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
08/09/2010 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
08/09/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4403.) To Assembly. | |||
06/30/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/29/2010 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |||
06/18/2010 | Set for hearing June 28. | |||
06/16/2010 | From committee: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3930.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/10/2010 | Set for hearing June 15. | |||
06/09/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
05/06/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
04/26/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |