LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR107
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR107
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR107
Compare Versions
SCR107 Chaptered September 7, 2010
SCR107 Enrolled September 2, 2010
SCR107 Amended August 26, 2010
SCR107 Amended June 9, 2010
SCR107 Introduced April 26, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SCR107 Chaptered September 7, 2010
SCR107 Enrolled September 2, 2010
SCR107 Amended August 26, 2010
SCR107 Amended June 9, 2010
SCR107 Introduced April 26, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare