09/07/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2010. | |||
09/07/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
08/31/2010 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
08/30/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6868.) To Senate. | |||
08/26/2010 | To Com. on RULES. From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 26.) | |||
08/20/2010 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
08/20/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4715.) To Assembly. | |||
08/17/2010 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
08/16/2010 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be placed on Consent Calendar. | |||
08/10/2010 | From committee: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4438.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
08/06/2010 | Set for hearing August 10. | |||
08/05/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
07/01/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. (Introduced measure version corrected July 6.) |