California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR118 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/07/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 118CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 129 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 7, 2010 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 20, 2010 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 30, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Denham (Coauthor: Assembly Member Galgiani) JULY 1, 2010 Relative to the Correctional Officer Jose Rivera Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 118, Denham. Correctional Officer Jose Rivera Memorial Highway. This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 99 in Atwater as the Correctional Officer Jose Rivera Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, On June 20, 2008, Federal Correctional Officer Jose Rivera was violently murdered by two inmates while employed at the United States Penitentiary Atwater in Atwater; and WHEREAS, Officer Rivera died needlessly at a very young age; and WHEREAS, It is important to remember Officer Rivera and to honor the contributions Officer Rivera made to our country; and WHEREAS, The third of five children, Officer Rivera grew up in Chowchilla and graduated from Le Grand High School in 2003; and WHEREAS, Shortly thereafter, Officer Rivera enlisted in the United States Navy; and WHEREAS, Officer Rivera served four years in the military, which included two tours in Iraq; and WHEREAS, After serving his country overseas, Officer Rivera returned to serve his country at home; and WHEREAS, Upon his return, Officer Rivera began working for the Federal Bureau of Prisons in Atwater; and WHEREAS, Upon his death, Officer Rivera was laid to rest at St. Patrick's Parish in Merced where services brought together friends, family, fellow officers, and other officials to honor Officer Rivera; and WHEREAS, Many attended from different agencies and numerous states from across the country to pay their respects; and WHEREAS, Officer Rivera's death is tragic and a reminder that the law enforcement officers who serve the public risk their lives on a daily basis; and WHEREAS, We can only hope that this small tribute to Officer Rivera and his family serves as a reminder of his sacrifice and that the safety of all of our law enforcement officers is a matter of statewide and national concern; and WHEREAS, Officer Rivera is survived by his mother Terry Rivera and his siblings; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the northbound and southbound portion of State Highway Route 99 between the Franklin Road exits and the Winton Way and Applegate Road exit in Atwater is hereby designated the Correctional Officer Jose Rivera Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing the special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit a copy of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.