09/07/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 130, Statutes of 2010. | |||
09/07/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
08/31/2010 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
08/31/2010 | To Com. on RULES. From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) To Third Reading. (Heard in committee on August 31.) Read and adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6959.) To Senate. | |||
08/30/2010 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
08/26/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. To Special Consent Calendar. Read and adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4942.) To Assembly. | |||
08/19/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
08/04/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |