BILL NUMBER: SCR 120CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 130 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 7, 2010 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 26, 2010 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 31, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 19, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Denham (Coauthor: Senator Cogdill) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Bill Berryhill and Tom Berryhill) AUGUST 4, 2010 Relative to the CHP Officer Earl Scott Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 120, Denham. CHP Officer Earl Scott Memorial Highway. This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 99 in Stanislaus County as the CHP Officer Earl Scott Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, On February 17, 2006, California Highway Patrol Officer Earl Scott was tragically shot and killed while making a traffic stop on State Highway Route 99 in Stanislaus County; and WHEREAS, Officer Scott was 36 years old and had served with the California Highway Patrol (CHP) for five years; and WHEREAS, Officer Scott came from a long line of family members who devoted themselves to public service under the auspices of the CHP, including his father and two uncles who retired from the CHP as sergeants, and a cousin who currently serves as a sergeant with the CHP; and WHEREAS, Officer Scott is remembered as being the first to volunteer for such causes as shaving his head for "Shave the Brave," a fundraiser for cancer victims; and WHEREAS, Officer Scott also frequently took youth Law Enforcement Explorers on ride-alongs; and WHEREAS, Officer Scott touched many lives and leaves behind many fellow officers whose friendship with Officer Scott was more akin to being a family; and WHEREAS, Officer Scott is survived by his father, stepmother, and sister; and WHEREAS, It is a fitting tribute to Officer Scott that we hereafter recognize a portion of State Highway Route 99 in his memory; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the portion of State Highway Route 99 between the Pelandale Avenue exit and Junction 219 in Stanislaus County is hereby designated the CHP Officer Earl Scott Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing the special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit a copy of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.