09/25/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 118, Statutes of 2009. | |||
09/25/2009 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | |||
09/08/2009 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 2289.) To enrollment. (Corrected September 15.) | |||
09/03/2009 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
09/02/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 2916.) To Senate. | |||
09/01/2009 | Amended. Placed on third reading. | |||
08/31/2009 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on August 31.) | |||
08/27/2009 | To Com. on RULES. | |||
05/14/2009 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
05/14/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 895.) To Assembly. | |||
05/11/2009 | From Special Consent Calendar. Placed on third reading. | |||
05/11/2009 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |||
04/29/2009 | Amended. (Corrected April 29.) Placed on third reading. | |||
04/28/2009 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 639.) | |||
04/14/2009 | Set for hearing April 22. | |||
02/02/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |