LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR13
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR13
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR13
Compare Versions
SCR13 Chaptered September 25, 2009
SCR13 Enrolled September 10, 2009
SCR13 Amended September 1, 2009
SCR13 Amended April 29, 2009
SCR13 Introduced February 2, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SCR13 Chaptered September 25, 2009
SCR13 Enrolled September 10, 2009
SCR13 Amended September 1, 2009
SCR13 Amended April 29, 2009
SCR13 Introduced February 2, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare