04/24/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 18, Statutes of 2009. | |||
04/24/2009 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |||
04/20/2009 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 542.) To enrollment. | |||
04/13/2009 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
04/02/2009 | Read, amended, and adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 757.) To Senate. | |||
03/31/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) To Third Reading. | |||
03/23/2009 | To Com. on RULES. | |||
03/12/2009 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
03/12/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 285.) To Assembly. | |||
03/09/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on third reading. | |||
03/02/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/23/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |