LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR16
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR16
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR16
Compare Versions
SCR16 Chaptered April 24, 2009
SCR16 Enrolled April 21, 2009
SCR16 Amended April 2, 2009
SCR16 Amended March 2, 2009
SCR16 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SCR16 Chaptered April 24, 2009
SCR16 Enrolled April 21, 2009
SCR16 Amended April 2, 2009
SCR16 Amended March 2, 2009
SCR16 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare