05/29/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 37, Statutes of 2009. | |||
05/29/2009 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 10 a.m. | |||
05/26/2009 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1010.) To enrollment. | |||
05/21/2009 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |||
05/14/2009 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
05/14/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1472.) To Senate. | |||
05/11/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on May 11.) | |||
05/04/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
04/02/2009 | To Com. on RULES. | |||
03/23/2009 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
03/23/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Read and adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 326.) To Assembly. | |||
03/16/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |