BILL NUMBER: SCR 23CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 37 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE MAY 29, 2009 ADOPTED IN SENATE MAY 26, 2009 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 14, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 4, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Steinberg MARCH 16, 2009 Relative to Chabad Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 23, Steinberg. Chabad Day. This measure would proclaim March 23 as Chabad Day in California. WHEREAS, California's Jewish community has been active in the formation of the state since the Gold Rush in 1849; and WHEREAS, In the Jewish world, the concept of mitzvah, the Jewish belief in doing good deeds, is a core belief in the Jewish community and religion; and WHEREAS, There are many branches of Judaism active in California today; and WHEREAS, Social and charitable organizations that provide community services, such as Chabad, have established themselves in California; and WHEREAS, The Jewish social organization that is named Chabad was established in this state in 1965, as a branch of the worldwide Chabad-Lubavitch movement under the leadership of the Lubavitcher Rebbe, Rabbi Menachem Mendel Schneerson; and WHEREAS, Since Chabad has been established in California, it has created a large network of educational and social services on the West Coast, including over 200 community centers, the National Drug Rehabilitation Center, numerous day schools, and 30 summer camps that offer scholarships for underprivileged children, children of the military, and new immigrants; and WHEREAS, Chabad's "L'Chaim-To Life!" Telethon was established 29 years ago with the goal of uniting and educating the entire community, from civic leaders and celebrities to politicians, including men, women, and children of all races and religions, for a night of song, dance, and hope; and WHEREAS, The state and its residents have continually commended community-based organizations, such as Chabad, that have tried to achieve the goal of "making this world a place of goodness and kindness"; and WHEREAS, The state recognizes the contributions that community-based organizations provide to the state and its residents through community service, in an effort to better the lives of the residents of our great state; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims March 23 as Chabad Day in California; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature urges all residents to do mitzvahs, one or more acts of goodness and kindness, each and every day; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.