05/29/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 41, Statutes of 2009. | |||
05/29/2009 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 10 a.m. | |||
05/21/2009 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
05/21/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1632.) To Senate. | |||
05/14/2009 | To Consent Calendar. | |||
05/11/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) To Third Reading. (Heard in committee on May 11.) | |||
04/30/2009 | To Com. on RULES. | |||
04/23/2009 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
04/23/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Read and adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 618.) To Assembly. | |||
04/16/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |