California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR33 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 05/29/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 33CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 41 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE MAY 29, 2009 ADOPTED IN SENATE APRIL 23, 2009 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 21, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senators Calderon, Correa, DeSaulnier, Ducheny, Lowenthal, and Wyland APRIL 16, 2009 Relative to Crohn's and Colitis Awareness Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 33, Calderon. Crohn's and Colitis Awareness Month. This measure would designate the month of May of each year to be Crohn's and Colitis Awareness Month. WHEREAS, 1.4 million American adults and children suffer from Crohn's disease and ulcerative colitis, two serious and chronic digestive diseases that can have life threatening complications; and WHEREAS, Over the last 50 years the diagnosis of Crohn's disease and ulcerative colitis has increased 20 fold, and continues to become more prevalent; and WHEREAS, In California, one in 200, or an estimated 200,000 residents, suffer from these digestive diseases, which are incurable illnesses that attack the digestive system causing abdominal pain, persistent diarrhea, rectal bleeding, fever, weight loss, hospitalization, and surgery; and WHEREAS, Between $1.4 billion and $1.8 billion are lost to businesses and workers because of Crohn's disease and ulcerative colitis; and WHEREAS, Due to the symptoms of these diseases, people often live in silence about their suffering; and WHEREAS, These diseases interfere with the ability to hold a job, raise a family, go to school, and maintain relationships; and WHEREAS, The symptoms and the chronic nature of these diseases may cause severe social isolation, depression, and anxiety; and WHEREAS, Diagnosis can occur at any age, but most people develop Crohn's disease and ulcerative colitis at the prime of their lives, between 15 and 35 years of age, with 10 percent of victims under the age of 18; and WHEREAS, The Crohn's and Colitis Foundation of America is a nonprofit, volunteer-driven organization dedicated to finding a cure and improving the quality of life for adults and children affected by these digestive diseases. The foundation has designated over $150 million for research, which has lead to the latest medical breakthroughs and genetic discoveries; and WHEREAS, An example of the impact of Crohn's disease is exemplified by Alexander Marcoccia, a 13-year-old Sacramento resident battling Crohn's disease. Alexander experienced five months of bleeding, extreme abdominal pain, fatigue, arthritis, nausea, and lost 17 percent of his body weight, leaving this once active boy challenged in his pursuit of school, sports, or any normal childhood activities; and WHEREAS, In the spring, and during May, the foundation hosts Take Steps for Crohn's and Colitis, the nation's largest annual event dedicated to finding the cure and improving the quality of life for the children and adults affected by these seldom discussed diseases; and WHEREAS, The Crohn's and Colitis Foundation of America honors Alexander Marcoccia for his courage in facing this difficult and painful disease; and WHEREAS, Alexander Marcoccia is the foundation's honored hero, and is encouraging his community to join him at the Take Steps event on May 9, 2009, at the State Capitol; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature joins Alexander Marcoccia, the Crohn's and Colitis Foundation of America, and the 1.4 million Americans who suffer from Crohn's disease and ulcerative colitis in the fight to defeat these debilitating digestive diseases and create critically needed public awareness by designating the month of May of each year to be Crohn's and Colitis Awareness Month; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.