|
07/14/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 69, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read and adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2448.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 1.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on May 11.)
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read and adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 624.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 399.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2009
|
Set for hearing March 31.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
12/01/2008
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|