BILL NUMBER: SCR 4CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 69 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 14, 2009 ADOPTED IN SENATE APRIL 23, 2009 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 9, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 24, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 9, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator DeSaulnier (Coauthor: Assembly Member Torlakson) DECEMBER 1, 2008 Relative to the Senator Daniel E. Boatwright Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 4, DeSaulnier. Senator Daniel E. Boatwright Highway. This measure would designate the portion of State Highway Route 680 that is between the Benicia-Martinez Bridge in Contra Costa County and State Highway Route 24 in the City of Walnut Creek as the Senator Daniel E. Boatwright Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, Senator Daniel E. Boatwright was elected to the California State Senate in 1980, and served for 16 years in the 7th Senate District, and before that, he served eight years in the California State Assembly, to which he was first elected in 1972; and WHEREAS, Senator Boatwright was born in Harrison, Arkansas, but moved to Vallejo, California, as a child, where he attended public schools, where his education was interrupted by service in the United States Army as a combat member of the infantry in Korea; and WHEREAS, Senator Boatwright attended Vallejo Junior College where he was chairman of the student council and Chairman of the California Community Colleges Student Council Association, and went on to receive both his B.A. degree and his law degree from the University of California at Berkeley; and WHEREAS, Senator Boatwright served as deputy district attorney in Contra Costa County, becoming chief trial deputy under then District Attorney John Nejedly before opening his own law firm in Concord in 1970; and WHEREAS, Senator Boatwright served as a city council member and Mayor of the City of Concord, Chairman of the Contra Costa County Consolidated Fire Board, and City Attorney for the City of Brentwood prior to his election to the California State Assembly; and WHEREAS, Senator Boatwright commenced, in 1972, a distinguished 24-year legislative career where he authored more than 350 laws and held several prominent committee chairmanships in each house, including chairmanships of the Assembly and Senate Revenue and Taxation Committees, the Assembly Ways and Means Committee, and the Senate Appropriations Committee, in which capacities he became legendary for his ability, year after year, to deliver state funding to cities, the county, and special districts for projects in his Contra Costa County-based district; and WHEREAS, From 1982 through 1992, Senator Boatwright worked tirelessly with the California Transportation Commission, the Department of Transportation, and the Department of Finance to secure funding and accelerate the construction and completion of State Highway Route 680 lane additions and the State Highway Route 680 and State Highway Route 24 interchange in Contra Costa County; and WHEREAS, Senator Boatwright is married to Teresa Boatwright and has three sons and four grandchildren who reside in Contra Costa County; and WHEREAS, Following his retirement from the Legislature in 1996, Senator Boatwright served as the Senate's representative in 1997 and 1998 to the California Medical Assistance Commission, and has since resumed the practice of law and begun the practice of lobbying; and WHEREAS, The Legislature wishes to recognize Senator Daniel E. Boatwright's extraordinary service to the community, particularly as that service has resulted in the improvement of central Contra Costa County's transportation infrastructure, specifically State Highway Route 680 and the State Highway Route 24 interchange; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the portion of State Highway Route 680 that is between the Benicia-Martinez Bridge in Contra Costa County and State Highway Route 24 in the City of Walnut Creek is hereby designated the Senator Daniel E. Boatwright Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing the special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit a copy of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for distribution.