07/20/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 83, Statutes of 2009. | |||
07/20/2009 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. | |||
07/16/2009 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1766.) To enrollment. | |||
07/09/2009 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |||
07/02/2009 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
07/02/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2362.) To Senate. | |||
06/30/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.) | |||
06/23/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
05/26/2009 | To Com. on RULES. | |||
05/14/2009 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
05/14/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. To Special Consent Calendar. Read and adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 899.) To Assembly. | |||
05/06/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |