LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR43
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR43
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR43
Compare Versions
SCR43 Chaptered July 20, 2009
SCR43 Enrolled July 17, 2009
SCR43 Amended June 23, 2009
SCR43 Amended May 28, 2009
SCR43 Introduced May 6, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SCR43 Chaptered July 20, 2009
SCR43 Enrolled July 17, 2009
SCR43 Amended June 23, 2009
SCR43 Amended May 28, 2009
SCR43 Introduced May 6, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare