06/16/2010 | Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/15/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
09/10/2009 | To Com. on ED. | |||
09/03/2009 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
09/02/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 2111.) To Assembly. | |||
08/27/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
08/26/2009 | Read third time. Amended. Placed on second reading file. | |||
08/18/2009 | Amended. Placed on third reading. | |||
08/17/2009 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 3. Page 1812.) | |||
07/23/2009 | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. Set for hearing July 23. | |||
07/15/2009 | Set for hearing July 20. | |||
07/08/2009 | Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
07/07/2009 | From committee: Be adopted as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1572.) | |||
06/26/2009 | Set for hearing July 1. | |||
06/25/2009 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
06/23/2009 | Set for hearing June 25. | |||
06/16/2009 | Set for hearing June 24. | |||
05/29/2009 | Set for hearing June 17. | |||
05/14/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
05/06/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |