LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR44
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR44
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR44
Compare Versions
SCR44 Amended March 15, 2010
SCR44 Amended August 26, 2009
SCR44 Amended August 18, 2009
SCR44 Amended July 8, 2009
SCR44 Introduced May 6, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SCR44 Amended March 15, 2010
SCR44 Amended August 26, 2009
SCR44 Amended August 18, 2009
SCR44 Amended July 8, 2009
SCR44 Introduced May 6, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare